OK HB2658 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public lands; in lieu payment; Commissioners of the Land Office; leases; effective date.
Title
Public lands; in lieu payment; Commissioners of the Land Office; leases; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2016-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 14 |
2016-03-08 | House | General Order |
2016-02-24 | House | Authored by Senator Marlatt (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-02-15 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee sub-committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Murdock |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |