OK HB2667 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; permitting residential care home to challenge statement of deficiency through informal or alternative dispute resolution; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; permitting residential care home to challenge statement of deficiency through informal or alternative dispute resolution; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Cox [R] | Sen. Ervin Yen [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 04/26/2016 |
2016-04-21 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-21 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2016-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-08 | House | Authored by Senator Yen (principal Senate author) |
2016-03-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Hoskin |
2016-03-08 | House | General Order |
2016-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2016-02-03 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Cox |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |