OK HB2722 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Workers' Compensation; modifying definition; effective date.
Title
Workers' Compensation; modifying definition; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | House | Approved by Governor 05/01/2018 |
2018-04-25 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-25 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2018-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 17 |
2018-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-12 | House | General Order |
2018-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Referred to General Government Oversight and Accountability |
2018-02-28 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Russ |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |