OK HB2742 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Consumer credit; amending various sections of Uniform Consumer Credit Code; effective date; emergency.
Title
Consumer credit; amending various sections of Uniform Consumer Credit Code; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Approved by Governor 05/01/2012 | |
2012-04-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-25 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-25 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-24 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-24 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-24 | Title restored | |
2012-04-24 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-04-24 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2012-04-02 | Title stricken | |
2012-04-02 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | |
2012-03-06 | First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-05 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-05 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman | |
2012-03-05 | General Order | |
2012-02-23 | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-23 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Peters | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
14A | 2 | 104 | New Code | See Bill Text |
14A | 2 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
14A | 3 | 102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
14A | 3 | 104 | New Code | See Bill Text |
14A | 3 | 310 | New Code | See Bill Text |
14A | 3 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
14A | 5 | 203 | New Code | See Bill Text |
14A | 6 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |