OK HB2750 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Referred to Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Referred to Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Capital punishment; transferring authority over executions to the Commissioner of Public Safety; effective date.
Title
Capital punishment; transferring authority over executions to the Commissioner of Public Safety; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to Public Safety |
2016-02-18 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Morrissette |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |