OK HB2751 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2751
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Remove Representative Miller as principal House author and substitute with Representative Staires
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Remove Representative Miller as principal House author and substitute with Representative Staires
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; removing certain apportionment limits; deleting requirements that certain excess funds be deposited; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; removing certain apportionment limits; deleting requirements that certain excess funds be deposited; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | House | Remove Representative Miller as principal House author and substitute with Representative Staires |
2023-02-15 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Miller |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2751 (Carry Over) 2023-02-15 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee