OK HB2759 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dentistry; modifying provisions related to the State Dental Act; effective date.
Title
Dentistry; modifying provisions related to the State Dental Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | House | Approved by Governor 05/01/2018 |
2018-04-25 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-25 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2018-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 2 |
2018-03-07 | House | Amended |
2018-03-07 | House | House Rule suspended |
2018-03-07 | House | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Josh), Ritze |
2018-03-07 | House | General Order |
2018-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Osborn (Leslie) |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 328 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 34 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 36 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 40A | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 43a | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 43b | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 44b | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 51a | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 53 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 328 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |