OK HB2764 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Conference granted, GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Conference granted, GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Education; creating the Education Finance Authority; membership; contributions; investments; earnings; income tax checkoff; effective date.
Title
Education; creating the Education Finance Authority; membership; contributions; investments; earnings; income tax checkoff; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2016-04-25 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2016-04-21 | House | SA's received |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-04-20 | Senate | coauthored by Wood |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2016-03-28 | Senate | coauthored by Loveless |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2016-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 15 |
2016-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Ford (principal Senate author) |
2016-03-02 | House | General Order |
2016-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-02-23 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2016-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Montgomery |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
68 | 2368 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 28 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 28 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |