OK HB2850 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2850
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Courts; creating the Office of Judicial Performance Evaluation; creating the Board of Judicial Performance Evaluation; effective date.
Title
Courts; creating the Office of Judicial Performance Evaluation; creating the Board of Judicial Performance Evaluation; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2023-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 8 |
2023-03-14 | House | Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-14 | House | General Order |
2023-02-09 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2850 (Carry Over) 2023-04-04 - Referred to Appropriations