OK HB2928 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Bail bondsmen; modifying bail bondsmen license requirements; effective date.
Title
Bail bondsmen; modifying bail bondsmen license requirements; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. John Sparks [D] | Rep. Dan Kirby [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House: Insurance Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House: Insurance Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 06/03/2014 |
2014-05-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-21 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2014-05-20 | Senate | CCR read |
2014-05-20 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-20 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-20 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-16 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2014-05-16 | House | Title restored |
2014-05-16 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Sparks, Newberry, Brown, Stanislawski, Paddack, Brinkley |
2014-05-05 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Insurance |
2014-04-23 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2014-02-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-02-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1 |
2014-02-26 | House | General Order |
2014-02-17 | House | Authored by Senator Sparks (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Kirby |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |