OK HB2936 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Banks and trust companies; relating to the Financial Privacy Act; raising fees for search and processing of financial records. Effective date.
Title
Banks and trust companies; relating to the Financial Privacy Act; raising fees for search and processing of financial records. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Wes Hilliard [D] | Sen. Dan Newberry [R] | Rep. Todd Russ [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-17 - House - House: (Y: 24 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2010-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/06/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-26 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-26 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-25 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-25 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-18 | CCR read | |
2010-05-18 | To Senate | |
2010-05-18 | Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 11 | |
2010-05-18 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 75 Nays: 10 | |
2010-05-17 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Russ | |
2010-05-17 | Measure failed: Ayes: 24 Nays: 60 | |
2010-05-17 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-06 | Title restored | |
2010-05-06 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-04 | Conference granted, SCs named Newberry, Jolley, Johnson (Mike), Coffee, Mazzei | |
2010-05-03 | HC's named: Russ, Sullivan, Carey, Auffet, McDaniel (Randy) | |
2010-04-21 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-12 | SA's received | |
2010-04-12 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-08 | Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 15 | |
2010-04-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-17 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-17 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-16 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2010-03-02 | First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-01 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-01 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 29 | |
2010-03-01 | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-01 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hilliard | |
2010-03-01 | General Order | |
2010-02-10 | CR; Do Pass Economic Development and Financial Services Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Russ | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |