OK HB2966 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Coauthored by Senator Pederson
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Coauthored by Senator Pederson
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; assault and battery; making certain acts unlawful; codification; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; assault and battery; making certain acts unlawful; codification; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pederson |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2024-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 4 |
2024-03-11 | House | General Order |
2024-02-21 | House | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Luttrell |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |