OK HB2975 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture; Homemade Food Freedom Act; product labeling; fee; registration number; effective date.
Title
Agriculture; Homemade Food Freedom Act; product labeling; fee; registration number; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Agriculture & Rural Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Agriculture Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Agriculture & Rural Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Agriculture Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Approved by Governor 04/18/2024 |
2024-04-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-16 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 6 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Affairs committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Affairs |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Stark |
2024-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-02-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2024-02-13 | House | General Order |
2024-02-06 | House | Authored by Senator Hamilton (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hefner |
2024-02-06 | House | CR; Do Pass Agriculture Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative West (Rick) |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |