OK HB2998 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/05/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/05/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Prisons and reformatories; authorizing Department of Corrections to implement a pilot program for certain inmates. Effective date.
Title
Prisons and reformatories; authorizing Department of Corrections to implement a pilot program for certain inmates. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-20 - House - House: (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Judiciary & Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Judiciary & Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/05/2010 | |
2010-05-24 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-24 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-24 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-21 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-21 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-21 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-20 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-05-20 | To Senate | |
2010-05-20 | Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-20 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hamilton | |
2010-05-20 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-18 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-18 | Title restored | |
2010-05-18 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Johnson (Constance) | |
2010-05-18 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-03 | HC's named: Steele, McDaniel (Jeannie), Hamilton, Miller, Cox | |
2010-04-28 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-04-22 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-20 | SA's received | |
2010-04-20 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-19 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-19 | coauthored by Garrison | |
2010-04-19 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-04-06 | coauthored by Pittman, Johnson, Shelton, Billy | |
2010-04-06 | coauthored by Bass, Easley, Leftwich | |
2010-04-06 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-04-06 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2010-04-05 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2010-04-05 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Bass, Leftwich, Easley | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary | |
2010-03-09 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Shelton, Johnson, Pittman, Billy | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-03-03 | First Reading | |
2010-03-03 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-02 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-02 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-02 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cox, Scott, Jett, Hilliard, Faught, Tibbs, McAffrey, McCullough, Sullivan, Morgan, McDaniel (Jeannie), Kern, Walker, Ownbey | |
2010-03-02 | General Order | |
2010-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-23 | Authored by Senator Lamb (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-23 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Peterson, Dorman, Denney, Jackson | |
2010-02-23 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Steele | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |