OK HB3011 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Referred for enrollment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Referred for enrollment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture; Oklahoma Industrial Hemp Program; effective date.
Title
Agriculture; Oklahoma Industrial Hemp Program; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. David Smith [R] | Sen. Chris Kidd [R] | Rep. John Waldron [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Corrected: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: Agriculture Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Corrected: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: Agriculture Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-30 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 0 |
2024-04-30 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2024-04-18 | House | SA's received |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 2 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Affairs committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Affairs |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Waldron |
2024-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-05 | House | General Order |
2024-02-13 | House | Authored by Senator Kidd (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Agriculture Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Smith |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |