OK HB3031 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; motor fuel tax; Oklahoma ambulance districts; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; motor fuel tax; Oklahoma ambulance districts; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Title restored |
2024-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2024-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cantrell |
2024-03-12 | House | General Order |
2024-02-22 | House | Title stricken |
2024-02-22 | House | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-02-13 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Maynard |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |