OK HB3045 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-15 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; authorizing Governor to appoint or replace certain persons; effective date.
Title
State government; authorizing Governor to appoint or replace certain persons; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 55 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Motion expired | |
2012-03-13 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Osborn | |
2012-03-13 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 55 | |
2012-03-13 | Amended | |
2012-03-13 | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) | |
2012-03-13 | General Order | |
2012-02-09 | CR; Do Pass Government Modernization Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Osborn | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |