OK HB3053 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Energy; directing Corporation Commission to evaluate relationship between Southwest Power Pool and the state; requiring report; establishing deadline; distribution; emergency.
Title
Energy; directing Corporation Commission to evaluate relationship between Southwest Power Pool and the state; requiring report; establishing deadline; distribution; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Energy & Telecommunications: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Energy & Telecommunications: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2024-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications |
2024-02-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-28 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-02-27 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-02-27 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2024-02-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Williams |
2024-02-27 | House | General Order |
2024-02-15 | House | Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Boles |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |