OK HB3081 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; directing State Board of Education to promulgate rules for restraint and seclusion; requiring rules to align with guidelines by the U.S. Department of Education; effective date.
Title
Schools; directing State Board of Education to promulgate rules for restraint and seclusion; requiring rules to align with guidelines by the U.S. Department of Education; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 9 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Motion expired |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Standridge |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 9 Nays: 31 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2018-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 4 |
2018-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-13 | House | General Order |
2018-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Cockroft |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |