OK HB3133 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Children; deprived child proceedings; authorizing prosecution of certain employees for certain violations; providing for punishment; effective date.
Title
Children; deprived child proceedings; authorizing prosecution of certain employees for certain violations; providing for punishment; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Brinkley [R] | Rep. Jason Nelson [R] | Rep. Pat Ownbey [R] | Rep. Pam Peterson [R] |
Rep. Wade Rousselot [D] | Rep. Mike Sanders [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-25 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: TABLE PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 3 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 38) [FAIL]
2012-05-22 - House - House: Conference Committee on Health: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: TABLE PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 3 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 38) [FAIL]
2012-05-22 - House - House: Conference Committee on Health: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-25 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-25 | coauthored by Brinkley | |
2012-05-25 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2012-05-25 | 2 CCR read | |
2012-05-25 | To Senate | |
2012-05-25 | Motion to reconsider tabled | |
2012-05-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 2 | |
2012-05-25 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2012-05-25 | House and Joint Rules suspended | |
2012-05-24 | Emergency removed | |
2012-05-24 | Remove Representative Steele as principal House author and substitute with Representative Sanders | |
2012-05-24 | 2 CCR submitted | |
2012-05-24 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2012-05-23 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2012-05-22 | Enacting clause restored | |
2012-05-22 | Emergency added | |
2012-05-22 | Title restored | |
2012-05-22 | CCR submitted | |
2012-05-22 | SCs named Treat, Bingman, David, Crain, Burrage, Ballenger | |
2012-05-22 | Withdrawn from GCCA - referred to conference | |
2012-05-07 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2012-05-02 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Health and Human Services | |
2012-04-17 | SA's received | |
2012-04-17 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-16 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-16 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-04-09 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-27 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2012-03-27 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2012-03-27 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2012-03-14 | First Reading | |
2012-03-14 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-13 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 3 | |
2012-03-13 | Title stricken | |
2012-03-13 | Amended | |
2012-03-13 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Peterson | |
2012-03-13 | General Order | |
2012-02-28 | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-28 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Rousselot, Nelson, Ownbey | |
2012-02-28 | Remove Representative Nelson as principal House author and substitute with Representative Steele | |
2012-02-28 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Human Services Committee | |
2012-02-23 | Referred to Human Services Committee | |
2012-02-23 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Nelson | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 601 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 1 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 1 | 10 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 1 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 1 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |