OK HB3136 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Referred to Judiciary - Criminal
Pending: House Judiciary - Criminal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Referred to Judiciary - Criminal
Pending: House Judiciary - Criminal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; authorizing chairs of committees to issue certain subpoenas; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; authorizing chairs of committees to issue certain subpoenas; effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2024-02-15 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Remove Representative Humphrey as principal House author and substitute with Representative Sterling |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Humphrey |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |