OK HB3152 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School boards; prohibition of certain relationships; providing exception; emergency.
Title
School boards; prohibition of certain relationships; providing exception; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Coody [R] | Sen. Paul Scott [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 31 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 68 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 59 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 68 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 59 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | House | Approved by Governor 04/23/2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-17 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-16 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 9 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 10 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2018-03-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 28; Ayes: 68 Nays: 19 |
2018-03-14 | House | Amended |
2018-03-14 | House | House Rule suspended |
2018-03-14 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 59 Nays: 25 |
2018-03-12 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Coody |
2018-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 51 |
2018-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Scott (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-12 | House | General Order |
2018-02-15 | House | Emergency added |
2018-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred to Common Education |
2018-02-07 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Coody |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |