OK HB3176 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Vetoed 04/30/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Vetoed 04/30/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; modifying certain time limitation; effective date.
Title
State government; modifying certain time limitation; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | House | Vetoed 04/30/2014 |
2014-04-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-24 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-23 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2014-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-05 | House | General Order |
2014-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Shortey (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred to Public Safety Committee |
2014-02-18 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Blackwell |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |