OK HB3211 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Higher education; adding eligibility requirement for the Oklahoma Higher Learning Access Program; effective date; emergency.
Title
Higher education; adding eligibility requirement for the Oklahoma Higher Learning Access Program; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Died in conference |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2014-05-08 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Higher Education and CareerTech |
2014-04-16 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-03-24 | Senate | coauthored by Brecheen |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 3 |
2014-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Halligan (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-11 | House | General Order |
2014-02-12 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Higher Education and CareerTech Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and CareerTech |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Hickman |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |