OK HB3251 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/05/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/05/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Methadone; relating to the Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Act; requiring registrants to check patient profiles on central repository; prohibiting certain glass tubes sale. Effective date.
Title
Methadone; relating to the Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Act; requiring registrants to check patient profiles on central repository; prohibiting certain glass tubes sale. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Crain [R] | Rep. Paul Roan [D] | Rep. Mike Shelton [D] | Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-13 - House - House: (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/05/2010 | |
2010-05-24 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-24 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-24 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-21 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-21 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-21 | coauthored by Shelton | |
2010-05-21 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-13 | CCR read | |
2010-05-13 | To Senate | |
2010-05-13 | Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-13 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-11 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-03 | HC's named: Tibbs, Martin (Steve), Brown, Hilliard, Peters | |
2010-05-03 | Conference granted, SCs named Crain, Jolley, Anderson, Eason McIntyre, Burrage | |
2010-04-22 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-12 | SA's received | |
2010-04-12 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-08 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-30 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-25 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2010-03-03 | First Reading | |
2010-03-03 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-02 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-02 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-02 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roan | |
2010-03-02 | General Order | |
2010-02-24 | Authored by Senator Crain (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-24 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Tibbs | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 374 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 518 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 646 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 2 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 302 | New Code | See Bill Text |