OK HB3286 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Insurance; requiring navigators to be registered; effective date.
Title
Insurance; requiring navigators to be registered; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: Insurance Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House: Insurance Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | House | Approved by Governor 05/21/2014 |
2014-05-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-16 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-15 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-15 | House | Motion expired |
2014-05-13 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Mulready |
2014-05-13 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 58 Nays: 25 |
2014-05-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Wood |
2014-05-13 | House | Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Shelton, Sherrer, McDaniel (Jeannie) |
2014-05-13 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2014-04-16 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 2 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Emergency removed |
2014-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance committee; CR filed |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Insurance |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-03-12 | Senate | coauthored by Shelton |
2014-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 3; Ayes: 75 Nays: 6 |
2014-03-11 | House | Emergency added |
2014-03-11 | House | Amended |
2014-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Ritze, McDaniel (Jeannie) |
2014-03-11 | House | General Order |
2014-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | Referred to Insurance Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Mulready |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 1415 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 1415 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 1415 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 1415 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 1415 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |