OK HB3289 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-12 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-12 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Criminal procedure; relating to sentencing powers of the court; authorizing court to prohibit certain person from residing near victims. Effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; relating to sentencing powers of the court; authorizing court to prohibit certain person from residing near victims. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | Title restored | |
2010-05-12 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-04 | HC's named: McNiel, Kirby, Nelson, Carey, Denney, Hamilton | |
2010-05-03 | Conference granted, SCs named Bingman, Anderson, Sykes, Crain, Laster | |
2010-04-27 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-14 | SA's received | |
2010-04-14 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-13 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-13 | Title stricken | |
2010-04-13 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2010-04-05 | coauthored by Pittman | |
2010-04-05 | Title stricken | |
2010-04-05 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-30 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-16 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Pittman | |
2010-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-03-08 | First Reading | |
2010-03-08 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-04 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-04 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-04 | Authored by Senator Bingman (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-04 | General Order | |
2010-02-25 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-03 | Withdrawn from Public Safety Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative McNiel | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 991a | New Code | See Bill Text | |
57 | 590 | New Code | See Bill Text |