OK HB3353 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; authorizing handgun licensees and certain military personnel to carry handgun while scouting; effective date.
Title
Firearms; authorizing handgun licensees and certain military personnel to carry handgun while scouting; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 56 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 56 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | House | Approved by Governor 04/23/2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-17 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-16 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2018-03-19 | Senate | coauthored by Hilbert |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 56 Nays: 11 |
2018-03-15 | House | Amended |
2018-03-15 | House | House Rule suspended |
2018-03-15 | House | Amended |
2018-03-15 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-15 | House | General Order |
2018-03-05 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred to General Government Oversight and Accountability |
2018-02-27 | House | Withdrawn from Public Safety Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | Referred to Public Safety |
2018-02-26 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Roberts (Sean) |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |