OK HB3384 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Civil procedure; discovery; effective date.
Title
Civil procedure; discovery; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Moore |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |