OK HB3400 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; requiring public high schools to make advance placement courses available to students; effective date.
Title
Schools; requiring public high schools to make advance placement courses available to students; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Approved by Governor 05/20/2020 |
2020-05-14 | House | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2020-05-14 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2020-05-14 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 |
2020-05-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from Education committee |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 7 |
2020-03-09 | House | Amended |
2020-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dollens, Bennett, Conley, Randleman, Brewer |
2020-03-09 | House | General Order |
2020-02-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano, Waldron, West (Tammy), Caldwell (Chad), Roberts (Dustin), Rosecrants, Vancuren |
2020-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Baker |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |