OK HB3403 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; requiring fetal alcohol syndrome education for certain licensees; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; requiring fetal alcohol syndrome education for certain licensees; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Randleman |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |