OK HB3457 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Higher Learning Access Program; providing eligibility for children of certain teachers; effective date; emergency.
Title
Oklahoma Higher Learning Access Program; providing eligibility for children of certain teachers; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Moore [R] | Sen. Adam Pugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2024-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 7 |
2024-03-05 | House | General Order |
2024-02-22 | House | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Moore |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |