OK HB3497 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure; deleting district attorney's supervision fee requirement; effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; deleting district attorney's supervision fee requirement; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 1 |
2024-03-11 | House | General Order |
2024-02-29 | House | Title stricken |
2024-02-29 | House | Authored by Senator Gollihare (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative West (Tammy) |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |