OK HB3541 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State government; Energy Discrimination Elimination Act of 2022; divestment; financial companies; procedures; reports; emergency.
Title
State government; Energy Discrimination Elimination Act of 2022; divestment; financial companies; procedures; reports; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Lepak [R] | Sen. Shane Jett [R] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2024-03-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 15 |
2024-03-13 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2024-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Jett (principal Senate author) |
2024-03-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle |
2024-03-13 | House | General Order |
2024-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Lepak |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |