OK HB3542 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State government; creating the Oklahoma Fusion Center; providing for the separation of the Oklahoma Counter Terrorism Intelligence Center from the Department of Public Safety; codification; effective date.
Title
State government; creating the Oklahoma Fusion Center; providing for the separation of the Oklahoma Counter Terrorism Intelligence Center from the Department of Public Safety; codification; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-03-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 5 |
2024-03-13 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2024-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) |
2024-03-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Burns |
2024-03-13 | House | General Order |
2024-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Public Safety |
2024-02-07 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Pfeiffer |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |