OK HB3671 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; authorizing Service Oklahoma to allow individuals to make certain voluntary designation; credentials; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; authorizing Service Oklahoma to allow individuals to make certain voluntary designation; credentials; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Miller [R] | Sen. Bill Coleman [R] | Rep. Tammy West [R] | Rep. John Talley [R] |
Sen. Jessica Garvin [R] | Sen. Blake Stephens [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Aeronautics & Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Aeronautics & Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Approved by Governor 04/22/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-17 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-16 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stephens |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Tammy) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 2 |
2024-03-05 | House | General Order |
2024-02-21 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Garvin |
2024-02-21 | House | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Talley |
2024-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Miller |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |