OK HB3752 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Domestic violence; increasing membership of the Board; effective date.
Title
Domestic violence; increasing membership of the Board; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. John Talley [R] | Sen. Ally Seifried [R] | Sen. Kay Floyd [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Approved by Governor 04/22/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-17 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-16 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Floyd |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2024-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-11 | House | Amended |
2024-03-11 | House | House Rule suspended |
2024-03-11 | House | General Order |
2024-02-06 | House | Authored by Senator Seifried (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-06 | House | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Talley |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |