OK HB3815 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Campaign finance; prohibiting acceptance of certain contributions; violations; codification; effective date.
Title
Campaign finance; prohibiting acceptance of certain contributions; violations; codification; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | House | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Elections and Ethics Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | Referred to Elections and Ethics |
2024-02-26 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules |
2024-02-15 | House | Withdrawn from Elections and Ethics Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Dollens |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |