OK HB3838 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Historical Society; Office of Tribal Relations; format; material; sources; deliver; effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Historical Society; Office of Tribal Relations; format; material; sources; deliver; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Ajay Pittman [D] | Sen. Chris Kidd [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate: General Government: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-03-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-14 | House | Authored by Senator Kidd (principal Senate author) |
2024-03-14 | House | General Order |
2024-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Pittman |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |