OK HB3854 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Investment rebate program; providing proof of services; setting maximum allowed rebate limit; creating the Water Infrastructure for Economic Development Fund; effective date; emergency.
Title
Investment rebate program; providing proof of services; setting maximum allowed rebate limit; creating the Water Infrastructure for Economic Development Fund; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 21 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | SA's received |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Emergency failed: Ayes: 10 Nays: 33 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 18 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 30 Nays: 13 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Bergstrom |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 21 Nays: 22 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Emergency added |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 17 |
2024-03-07 | House | Title stricken |
2024-03-07 | House | Amended |
2024-03-07 | House | General Order |
2024-02-29 | House | Emergency removed |
2024-02-29 | House | Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Cornwell |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |