OK HB3952 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; creating the Oklahoma Universal Changing Stations Act; requiring installation and maintenance of a universal changing station in certain public buildings; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; creating the Oklahoma Universal Changing Stations Act; requiring installation and maintenance of a universal changing station in certain public buildings; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 19 |
2020-03-10 | House | Title stricken |
2020-03-10 | House | Amended |
2020-03-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Echols, Rosecrants |
2020-03-10 | House | General Order |
2020-02-13 | House | Authored by Senator Brooks (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Dollens |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |