OK HB3953 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; creating a grant program subject to funding availability to employ school nurses, audiologists, and school-based mental health professionals; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; creating a grant program subject to funding availability to employ school nurses, audiologists, and school-based mental health professionals; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Blancett |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |