OK HB3966 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Higher education; establishing the School of American Civic Thought and Leadership at the University of Central Oklahoma; providing purpose; effective date.
Title
Higher education; establishing the School of American Civic Thought and Leadership at the University of Central Oklahoma; providing purpose; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Sen. Adam Pugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 22 |
2024-03-06 | House | General Order |
2024-02-29 | House | Title stricken |
2024-02-29 | House | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |