OK HB4050 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Higher education; private educational institutions; religious degrees; modifier; effective date; emergency.
Title
Higher education; private educational institutions; religious degrees; modifier; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Stan May [R] | Sen. Dana Prieto [R] | Sen. David Bullard [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Approved by Governor 04/23/2024 |
2024-04-18 | House | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-18 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2024-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 2 |
2024-03-07 | House | General Order |
2024-02-19 | House | Authored by Senator Prieto (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-19 | House | CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative May |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |