OK HCR1028 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 72-30)
Status: Passed on May 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 72-30)
Status: Passed on May 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Honoring and commending Frances M. Percival; distribution.
Title
Honoring and commending Frances M. Percival; distribution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | House | Filed with Secretary of State |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-21 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Considered |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2014-05-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-05-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-05 | House | Adopted, referred for engrossment |
2014-05-05 | House | Coauthored by all other Representatives |
2014-05-05 | House | Considered |
2014-03-27 | House | Authored by Senator Johnson (Constance) (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-27 | House | Authored by Representative Shelton |
2014-03-27 | House | Introduced |