OK HCR1050 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Health care; memorializing Congress to provide health care programs to elderly, uninsured and low-income individuals by implementing block grants to the states.
Title
Health care; memorializing Congress to provide health care programs to elderly, uninsured and low-income individuals by implementing block grants to the states.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2010-05-27 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-27 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-26 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-26 | Adopted, returned to House | |
2010-05-26 | Considered | |
2010-05-26 | Direct to Calendar | |
2010-03-01 | First Reading | |
2010-03-01 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-02-25 | Adopted, referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-25 | Ayes: 84 Nays: 5 | |
2010-02-25 | Authored by Senator Coffee (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-25 | Considered | |
2010-02-24 | Authored by Representative Benge | |
2010-02-24 | Introduced |