OK HJR1068 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Joint Resolution approving permanent rules of the State Board of Licensure for Professional Engineers and Land Surveyors; distribution.
Title
Joint Resolution approving permanent rules of the State Board of Licensure for Professional Engineers and Land Surveyors; distribution.
Sponsors
Sen. Al McAffrey [D] | Sen. Kay Floyd [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - House: Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - House: Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | House | Approved by Governor 05/31/2013 |
2013-05-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-05-24 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 5 |
2013-05-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2013-05-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-05-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-05-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-05-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-14 | House | Authored by Senator McAffrey (principal Senate author) |
2013-05-14 | House | General Order |
2013-05-08 | House | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee |
2013-05-01 | House | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer |
2013-04-30 | House | Authored by Representative Floyd |
2013-04-30 | House | First Reading |