OK SB1005 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Crime and punishment; rights of human trafficking victims; protective custody; emergency custody; forcible sodomy, rape, lewd or indecent proposals definitions and inclusions. Effective date.
Title
Crime and punishment; rights of human trafficking victims; protective custody; emergency custody; forcible sodomy, rape, lewd or indecent proposals definitions and inclusions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/02/2018 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2018-04-25 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2018-04-03 | Senate | HAs read |
2018-04-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1 |
2018-04-02 | House | General Order |
2018-03-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2018-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Griffin |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |