OK SB1057 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1057
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - SCs named Rosino, Coleman, Thompson (Kristen), Haste, Brooks
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - SCs named Rosino, Coleman, Thompson (Kristen), Haste, Brooks
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; creating the Marissa Murrow Act; authorizing the ABLE Commission to establish event venue license. Effective date.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; creating the Marissa Murrow Act; authorizing the ABLE Commission to establish event venue license. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rosino [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Rep. Brian Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 56 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | SCs named Rosino, Coleman, Thompson (Kristen), Haste, Brooks |
2024-04-22 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Request for conference and rejection of HAs rescinded |
2023-05-01 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2023-05-01 | Senate | HAs read |
2023-05-01 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-27 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-04-27 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 56 Nays: 30 |
2023-04-27 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2023-04-27 | House | Considered |
2023-04-27 | House | Laid over |
2023-04-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hill |
2023-04-27 | House | General Order |
2023-04-27 | House | House Rule suspended |
2023-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2023-03-22 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Business and Commerce |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from Public Safety committee |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rosino |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1057 (Carry Over) 2023-05-02 - Request for conference and rejection of HAs rescinded