OK SB1113 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Asset forfeiture; requiring payment of fees, costs and interest to prevailing party in certain actions. Effective date.
Title
Asset forfeiture; requiring payment of fees, costs and interest to prevailing party in certain actions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/28/2016 |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-04-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 6 |
2016-04-21 | House | General Order |
2016-03-22 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure |
2016-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Title restored |
2016-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2016-03-07 | Senate | coauthored by Grau (principal House author) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | coauthored by Loveless |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holt |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |